EP1517564 - System and method for providing location based services to a wireless terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagracard S.A. 22, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2005/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenger, Joel Chemin de la Faucille 8 1295 Mies / CH | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. 62 route de Clementy 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 03103426.7 | 17.09.2003 | [2005/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1517564 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
G01C21/26 (EP);
H04W4/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/50] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung ortsabhängiger Dienste für ein Mobilgerät | [2005/12] | English: | System and method for providing location based services to a wireless terminal | [2005/12] | French: | Système et méthode de provision de services localisés vers un terminal sans fil | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/32] | 02.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/32] | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.11.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0030379 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,14,15 * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 18 * * page 8, lines 3-13 * * page 9, lines 20-24 * * page 11, lines 7-12 * * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 7 * * figures 1,2,4,6 * * abstract * [Y] 8,16; | [XY]WO0040038 (AMERICAN CALCAR INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11-13,17-19,21,22 * abstract * * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 11 * * page 15, line 12 - page 17, line 7 * * page 19, line 31 - page 20, line 11 * * page 20, line 34 - page 21, line 1 * * page 22, line 4 - page 26, line 18 * * page 29, line 16 - page 30, line 3 * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 8,20; | [Y]US2002023264 (AALTONEN JANNE [FI], et al) [Y] 8,16,20 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0021] , [0024] - [0026] *; | [XY]US6522250 (ERNST DARRELL E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,14,15 * abstract * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 18; figure 1 * [Y] 8,16; | [XY]US2003060211 (CHERN VINCENT [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11-13,17-19,21,22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] , [0032] - [0035] - [0038] - [0045] - [0049] - [0053] - [0061] * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 8,20 |