EP1378353 - Printing couple in a printing machine with a pivotable transfer cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2004/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holm, Helmut Eugen-Blass-Str. 11 97250, Erlabrunn / DE | 02 /
Liebler, Manfred Herrmann Gartenstr. 21 97837, Erlenbach / DE | 03 /
Wirth, Manfred Walter Unterer Weinbergsweg 23 97794, Rieneck / DE | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Thomas Koenig & Bauer AG Lizenzen-Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | Hoffmann, Thomas Koenig & Bauer AG Lizenzen-Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 D-97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03103442.4 | 06.04.2002 | [2004/02] | Priority number, date | DE2001117703 | 09.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10117703 | DE2001138221 | 03.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10138221 | [2004/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1378353 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1378353 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41F7/12, B41F13/004, B41F13/008, B41F13/30, B41F13/32, B41F13/36 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
B41F13/10 (EP,US);
B41F13/08 (KR);
B41F13/0045 (EP,US);
B41F13/008 (EP,US);
B41F13/28 (EP,US);
B41F13/30 (EP,US);
B41F13/32 (EP,US);
B41F13/36 (EP,US);
B41F27/10 (EP,US);
B41F27/12 (EP,US);
B41F7/12 (EP,US);
B41P2213/20 (EP,US);
B41P2213/206 (EP,US);
B41P2213/734 (EP,US);
B41P2227/10 (EP,US);
B41P2227/11 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/02] | B41F7/12, B41F13/004, B41F13/008, B41F13/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Title | German: | Druckwerk einer Druckmaschine mit einem verschwenkbaren Übertragungszylinder | [2004/02] | English: | Printing couple in a printing machine with a pivotable transfer cylinder | [2004/02] | French: | Groupe d'impression d'une machine d'imprimerie comportant un cylindre de transfert pivotant | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 09.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02742672.5 / EP1377455 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0862999 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE19853114 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |