EP1404042 - Mixing method, mixing apparatus, and program for implementing the mixing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okabayashi, Masaaki Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho 430-8650, Hamamatsu-shi / JP | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Ascherl, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Ascherl, Andreas, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03103505.8 | 23.09.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | JP20020284973 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002284973 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404042 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04H7/00 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
H04H60/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/52] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mmischverfahren, Mischvorrichtung und Programm zur Durchführung des Mischverfahrens | [2004/14] | English: | Mixing method, mixing apparatus, and program for implementing the mixing method | [2004/14] | French: | Procédé de mélange, dispositif de mélange et programme pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé de mélange | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 02.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/14] | 07.11.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPH0715284 (YAMAHA CORP) [DY] 2,5,8* abstract *; | [XY]EP1058414 (TEAC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9 * column 5, lines 33-48 * * column 6, lines 21-25 * * column 6, lines 30-39 * * column 8, lines 14-19; figure 1 * [Y] 2,5,8 | Examination | JPH0715284 | by applicant | EP1058414 |