EP1442918 - Method for displaying vehicle specific information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benzler, Ulrich-Lorenz Loewenberger Str. 9 30855, Langenhagen / DE | 02 /
Placke, Lars Fraunhofer Str. 3 30163, Hannover / DE | [2004/32] | Application number, filing date | 03103888.8 | 21.10.2003 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | DE2003103792 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10303792 | [2004/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1442918 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1442918 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60K35/00, B60K31/00, B60K28/06 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
B60K31/0008 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/211 (EP,US);
B60K2360/143 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1438 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/21] |
Former [2004/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anzeige fahrzeugspezifischer Informationssignale | [2004/32] | English: | Method for displaying vehicle specific information | [2004/32] | French: | Procédé d'affichage des informations spécifiques d'un véhicule | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/38] | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001171392 ; | [X]FR2726094 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1,2,12 * page 2, lines 18-31 * * page 5, line 18 - page 9, line 27 *; | [X]US6009355 (OBRADOVICH MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 63 * * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 10 * * column 11, line 55 - column 16, line 37; figure 11 *; | [A]DE19941962 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]EP1223083 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,12 * paragraphs [0064] - [0076]; figures 16A,16B,16C,17 *; | [XY]WO02081251 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,12 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 1 - page 17, paragraph 3 * [Y] 4; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001171392 A 20010626 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [X] 1,12 * abstract * | [Y] - CLIVE CUSSLER, Dragon, LONDON, HARPERCOLLINSPUBLISHERS, (1993), XP002277659 [Y] 4 * pages 183-191 * |