EP1445750 - Method for transmission of traffic-relevant information and apparatus for its evaluation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feindt, Uwe Diestelberg 12 31157 Sarstedt / DE | 02 /
Skwarek, Volker Welfenhoehe 21 31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE | 03 /
Duckeck, Ralf Osterstrasse 5 31134 Hildesheim / DE | 04 /
Selem, Moez Almstrasse 33 31134 Hildesheim / DE | [2004/33] | Application number, filing date | 03104272.4 | 19.11.2003 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | DE2003104546 | 04.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10304546 | [2004/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1445750 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1445750 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/09, H04H1/00 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
G08G1/092 (EP);
H04H20/55 (EP);
H04H20/57 (EP);
H04H20/72 (EP);
H04H40/18 (EP);
H04H60/51 (EP);
H04H2201/13 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/20] |
Former [2004/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung verkehrsrelevanter Informationen sowie Gerät zur Auswertung | [2004/33] | English: | Method for transmission of traffic-relevant information and apparatus for its evaluation | [2004/33] | French: | Procédé de transmission des informations de trafic significatives et appareil d'évaluation | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 12.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5649297 (PARK DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, lines 31-44 ** column 4, lines 36-44 *; | [Y]EP1150265 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-8,10,11 * column 2, lines 6-32 *; | [EL]EP1376512 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [EL] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y] - Traffic and Traveller Information (TTI)- TTI Messages via Traffic Message Coding; Coding Protocol for Radio Data System - Traffic Mesasge Channel (RDS-TCM), Version 2.11, Revised Version; European Prestandard, ENV/278/4/1/0012, BRUSSELS, EUROPEAN COMMITTEE FOR STANDARDIZATION, (199606), XP002285633 [Y] 1-8,10,11 * pages 26,50,54 * |