EP1431525 - Control device for valves in a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Ventiltrieb GmbH Haldenstrasse 7 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states MAHLE Ventiltrieb GmbH Haldenstr. 7 70378 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lechner, Martin Dr. Im Feldle 4 70378, Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Hoffmann, Hermann Riedgrafweg 65 70599, Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Steinmetz, Christoph Wunnensteinstr. 18/3 71634, Ludwigsburg / DE | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
Lechner, Martin Im Feldle 4 70378, Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
Hoffmann, Hermann Riedgrafweg 65 70599, Stuttgart / DE | |||
03 /
Steinmetz, Christoph Wunnensteinstr. 18/3 71634, Ludwigsburg / DE | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft, Rotermund + Pfusch + Bernhard Waiblinger Strasse 11 70372 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03104336.7 | 24.11.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | DE2002158277 | 13.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10258277 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431525 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431525 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/12, F01L13/00, F02D13/02 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F01L13/0005 (EP);
F01L13/0063 (EP);
F01L2305/00 (EP);
F02D13/0207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/01] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuereinrichtung für Gaswechselventile eines Verbrennungsmotors | [2004/26] | English: | Control device for valves in a combustion engine | [2004/26] | French: | Appareil de contrôle pour soupapes d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 09.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2335632 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4326331 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US6019076 (PIERIK RONALD JAY [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6029618 (HARA SEINOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6145485 (BIDLINGMAIER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001037782 (PIERIK RONALD J [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10100173 (FEV MOTORENTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |