EP1535766 - Motor vehicle wheel suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC, A subsidary of Ford Motor Company Fairlane Plaza South, Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2011/37] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC, A subsidary of Ford Motor Company 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frantzen, Michael Johannes Schleckheimer Str. 94 52076 Aachen / DE | 02 /
David, Wolfgang, Dr. Vaalser Strasse 98 52074 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Porschen, Peter Am Keuschenend 123a 50170 Kerpen / DE | 04 /
Simon, Marc Niehler Str. 300 50735 Köln / DE | 05 /
Zandbergen, Paul Viergrenzenweg 198 6291 BX Vaals / NL | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, Dr.-Ing., et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03104361.5 | 25.11.2003 | [2005/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535766 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535766 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60G3/06, B60G7/02, B60G11/23, B60G11/38 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
B60G11/23 (EP);
B60G11/38 (EP);
B60G3/06 (EP);
B60G7/02 (EP);
B60G2202/114 (EP);
B60G2202/1424 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/08] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Radaufhängung für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2005/22] | English: | Motor vehicle wheel suspension | [2005/22] | French: | Suspension de roue de véhicule automobile | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1152493 (LUXEMBOURG BREV PARTICIPATIONS) [Y] 1-4,6 * page 2 - page 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]JPH08156829 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-4,6 * abstract *; | [A]US6029987 (HOFFMAN MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 5* column 2, line 50 - line 63; figure 3 * | by applicant | FR1152493 | JPH08156829 | US6029987 |