EP1332818 - Equalizing chuck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grobbel, Thomas Michael 1421 Pinecrest Drive Ferndale, Michigan 48200 / US | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2003/32] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250011.8 | 02.01.2003 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | US20020044101 | 11.01.2002 Original published format: US 44101 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1332818 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1332818 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332818 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/18, B23B31/14 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
B23B31/18 (EP,US);
B23B31/16 (KR);
B23B2231/22 (EP,US);
Y10T279/188 (EP,US);
Y10T279/1953 (EP,US);
Y10T279/243 (EP,US);
Y10T279/25 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/32] | B23B31/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/32] | Title | German: | Futter mit Ausgleich | [2003/32] | English: | Equalizing chuck | [2003/32] | French: | Mandrin avec égalisation | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.09.2009 | BE | 23.09.2009 | BG | 23.09.2009 | CY | 23.09.2009 | CZ | 23.09.2009 | DK | 23.09.2009 | EE | 23.09.2009 | FI | 23.09.2009 | NL | 23.09.2009 | SE | 23.09.2009 | SI | 23.09.2009 | SK | 23.09.2009 | TR | 23.09.2009 | GR | 24.12.2009 | GB | 02.01.2010 | IE | 02.01.2010 | LU | 02.01.2010 | ES | 03.01.2010 | PT | 25.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | HU | 24.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
GB | 02.01.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2010 | ||
LU | 02.01.2010 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
HU | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
GB | 02.01.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2010 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
HU | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
GB | 02.01.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2010 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
GB | 02.01.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2010 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
GB | 02.01.2010 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 23.09.2009 | |
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 23.09.2009 | |
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 23.09.2009 | |
SE | 23.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3365206 (GEORGE HOHWART, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 28; figure 8 *; | [A]FR2248901 (PRECISION INDUSTRIELLE [FR]) [A] 1,3,10 * page 2, line 36 - page 4, line 14; figure 2 *; | [A]US5848795 (MASATSUGU NAOYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 8* column 6, line 1 - line 5; figure 1 * | by applicant | US3365206 |