EP1341272 - Three-dimensional optical amplifier structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JDS Uniphase Corporation 1768 Automation Parkway San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2003/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Georges, Patrick 2 residence Marceau Palaiseau 91120 / FR | 02 /
Balembois, François 52 Domaine de Montvoisin Gometz la Ville 91400 / FR | 03 /
Devilder, Pierre Jean La Chapelle 38660 Sainte Marie Du Mont / FR | 04 /
Forget, Sebastien 2 avenue Jeanne d'Arc Arcueil 94110 / FR | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | McKechnie, Neil Henry, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | McKechnie, Neil Henry, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2003/36] | McKechnie, Neil, et al Kennedys Patent Agency Limited, Floor 5, Queens House, 29 St. Vincent Place Glasgow G1 2DT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250198.3 | 13.01.2003 | [2003/36] | Priority number, date | CA20022368031 | 15.01.2002 Original published format: CA 2368031 | CA20022370037 | 01.02.2002 Original published format: CA 2370037 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1341272 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1341272 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/063, H01S3/23, H01S3/0941, H01S3/06 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
H01S3/2341 (EP,US);
H01S3/09415 (EP,US);
H01S3/005 (EP,US);
H01S3/0604 (EP,US);
H01S3/2325 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/36] | H01S3/063, H01S5/50, H01S5/10, H01S3/23 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/02] |
Former [2003/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dreidimensionaleroptische Verstärker Struktur | [2003/36] | English: | Three-dimensional optical amplifier structure | [2003/36] | French: | Structure amplificateur optique à trois dimensions | [2003/36] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/30] | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.11.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5546222 (PLAESSMANN HENRY [US], et al) [XD] 1-10 * column 19, line 59 - column 20, line 41 * * column 21, line 65 - column 22, line 25; figures 12a,13a,13b,14 *; | [X]DE10005194 (UNIV STUTTGART STRAHLWERKZEUGE [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-10 * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 20 * * column 8, line 39 - column 11, line 26; figures 1-3 *; | [X] - SCOTT A M ET AL, "EFFICIENT HIGH-GAIN LASER AMPLIFICATION FROM A LONG-GAIN AMPLIFIER BY USE OF SELF-IMAGING MULTIPASS GEOMETRY", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,WASHINGTON, US, (20010520), vol. 40, no. 15, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 2461 - 2467, XP001066025 [X] 1,2,7-10 * page 2462, column L, paragraph 4 - page 2463, column L, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.40.002461 | [XA] - DRUON F ET AL, "HIGH-REPETITION-RATE 300-PS PULSED ULTRAVIOLET SOURCE WITH A PASSIVELY Q-SWITCHED MICROCHIP LASER AND A MULTIPASS AMPLIFIER", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (19990401), vol. 24, no. 7, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 499 - 501, XP000829716 [X] 9,10 * page 499, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 500, column R, paragraph 3 - page 501, column R, paragraph 1; figure 2 * [A] 8 | [XA] - OLSON T E ET AL, "MULTIPAS DIODE-PUMPED ND:YAG OPTICAL AMPLIFIERS AT 1.06 MUM AND 1.32 MUM", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19940501), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 605 - 608, XP000446972 [X] 9,10 * Section II: Amplifier design *;; figure 1 * [A] 1-4,6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.285555 | [PX] - FORGET S ET AL, "A new 3D multipass amplifier based on Nd:YAG or Nd:YVO4 crystals", APPLIED PHYSICS B (LASERS AND OPTICS) SPRINGER-VERLAG GERMANY, (200210), vol. B75, no. 4-5, ISSN 0946-2171, pages 481 - 485, XP002318726 [PX] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00340-002-0997-2 | [PX] - FORGET S ET AL, "New 3D multipass amplification scheme based on diode-pumped Nd:YAG or Nd:YVO4 crystals", CONFERENCE ON LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS. (CLEO 2002). TECHNICAL DIGEST. POSTCONFERENCE EDITION. LONG BEACH, CA, MAY 19 - 24, 2002, TRENDS IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS. (TOPS), WASHINGTON, WA : OSA, US, (20020519), VOL. 73, ISBN 1-55752-706-7, pages 390 - 391, XP010606866 [PX] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document * |