EP1331357 - Method of forming permeable sand screens in well bores [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan, Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, Philip D. 1107 Jones Avenue Duncan, OK 73533 / US | 02 /
Restarick, Henry L. 2050 Keller Springs Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | 03 /
Dusterhoft, Ronald G. 1902 Crescent Common Drive Katy, TX 77494 / US | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250274.2 | 16.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | US20020053054 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: US 53054 | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331357 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1331357 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/08, E21B43/02, C04B28/02 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B26/10 (EP,US);
C09K8/42 (EP,US);
C09K8/44 (EP,US);
C09K8/46 (EP,US);
E21B43/082 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B26/10, C04B14/06 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B14/28, C04B24/383 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/17] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von durchlässigen Sandfiltern in Bohrlöchern | [2003/31] | English: | Method of forming permeable sand screens in well bores | [2003/31] | French: | Méthode pour former des tamis à sable poreux dans les puits de forage | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.02.2010 | [2010/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU874990 ; | [A]US2257344 (MALONEY JOE F) [A] 3* the whole document *; | [A]EP0933498 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 5 *; | [A]US6016870 (DEWPRASHAD BRAHMADEO T [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 25 - column 9, line 47 *; | [A]US6202751 (CHATTERJI JITEN [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 41 - column 5, line 63 *; | [PX]EP1176126 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [PX] 1-17 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 33 * * page 4, line 45 - page 6, line 19 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 34, Database accession no. 1982-71834E, XP002239555 & SU874990 A 19811025 (AZERB PETRO IND RES) [A] 3 * abstract * |