EP1332675 - Synergistic microbicidal combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/32] | Synergistic microbicidal combinations | ||
[2004/47] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | ||
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106 / US | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | ||
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Rohm and Haas 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Warwick Eileen Fleck 1221 Snyder Road Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US | 02 /
Diehl, Megan Anne 24 Maple Avenue Line Lexington, Pennsylvania 18932 / US | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2012/45] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2005/01] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Patent Department 28th. Floor, City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | ||
Former [2003/32] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Operations Patent Dept. Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250329.4 | 18.01.2003 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | US20020352621P | 31.01.2002 Original published format: US 352621 P | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1332675 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1332675 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332675 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1332675 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/80, // (A01N43/80, 43:50, 43:40, 39:00, 37:36, 37:34, 37:10, 37:06, 31:04) | [2012/45] | CPC: |
A01N43/80 (EP,BR);
A01N31/04 (BR);
A01N31/14 (BR);
A01N35/10 (BR);
A01N37/06 (BR);
A01N37/34 (BR);
A01N37/36 (BR);
A01N43/50 (BR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/80, A01N43/50, A01N43/40, A01N39/00, A01N37/36, A01N37/34, A01N37/10, A01N37/06, A01N31/04 (EP);
A01N43/80, A01N59/16, A01N43/50, A01N43/40, A01N39/00, A01N37/36, A01N37/34, A01N37/10, A01N37/06, A01N35/02, A01N31/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/32] | A01N43/80, // (A01N43/80, 43:50, 43:40, 39:00, 37:36, 37:34, 37:10, 37:06, 31:04) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/26] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Synergistische mikrobizide Kombination | [2004/47] | English: | Synergistic microbicidal combination | [2004/47] | French: | Association microbicide synergique | [2004/47] |
Former [2003/32] | Synergistische mikrobizide Kombinationen | ||
Former [2003/32] | Synergistic microbicidal combinations | ||
Former [2003/32] | Associations microbicides synergiques | Examination procedure | 31.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04078581.8 / EP1525797 | EP04255357.8 / EP1502508 | EP04255358.6 / EP1488699 | EP04257939.1 / EP1523887 | EP04257944.1 / EP1527684 | EP04257945.8 / EP1527685 | EP04257946.6 / EP1621076 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2006
06.02.2006
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Poganiuch, Peter, et al, et al BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2006
06.02.2006
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Poganiuch, Peter, et al, et al BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX / K - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2006
BASF Aktiengesellschaft Global Intellectual Property Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06.03.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.11.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.01.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.01.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.09.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 28.06.2008 | Appeal received No. T1326/08 | 05.09.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.01.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 10.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04270203 ; | [X]GB2138799 (DEARBORN CHEMICALS LTD) [X] 1,6,10 * claims 1,5,18-20 *; | [X]EP0398795 (KATAYAMA CHEMICAL WORKS CO [JP]) [X] 1,4,10 * claims 1,2,5 *; | [X]EP0435439 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * claims 1,5 * * page 5, line 23 - line 26 *; | [X]EP0450916 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,6,10 * claims 1-3,5 *; | [X]EP0508457 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [X] 9 * page 13, line 45 - line 50 *; | [A]EP0544418 (ROHM & HAAS [US]); | [X]US5227156 (WIESE ROBERT S [US]) [X] 1,7,10 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0745324 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,6,9,10 * claims 1,3 *; | [X]EP0773281 (SCHUELKE & MAYR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,10 * claims 1,2,7 * * page 3, line 39 *; | [X]WO9908530 (THOR CHEMIE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,10 * claims 1,13,14 * * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 2 * * page 8, line 13 - line 22 *; | [X]EP0923867 (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,10 * claims 1,6 *; | [X]US6114366 (LUTZ PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10 * claims 1-3 * * column 4, line 5 - line 7 *; | [X]US6121302 (ROTHENBURGER STEPHEN JUDE [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10 * claims 1,4,5 *; | [X]EP1044609 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,2,10 * claims 1,2 * * table 1 *; | [X]WO0100022 (H F F F HAUT FOURNEAU FORGES E [FR], et al) [X] 1,6,10 * example 3 *; | [X]EP1082901 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,5,6,9,10 * claims 1,4,5,8 *; | [X]EP1084619 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,5,10 * claims 1-4 *; | [X]WO0119325 (FIRST SCIENT INC [US]) [X] 1,3,10 * claims 12,19 * * example 2 *; | [XP]WO0217716 (THOR GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1,5,7,10 * claims 1,5 * * example 5 * * page 3, line 3 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 45, Database accession no. 1992-369386, XP002249377 & JPH04270203 A 19920925 (SHINTO PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1,4,10 * abstract * | Opposition | WO0010393 |