EP1336810 - Joining structure of piping to a flange [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanoh Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 758, Kounosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Sanoh Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 758, Kounosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sunaga, Yasuo c/o Sanoh Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, 758 Kounosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 02 /
Tamai, Akiyoshi c/o Sanoh Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, 758 Kounosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | [2005/24] |
Former [2003/34] | 01 /
Sunaga, Yasuo c/o Sanch Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, 758 Kounosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | ||
02 /
Tamai, Akiyoshi c/o Sanch Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, 758 Kounosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250391.4 | 22.01.2003 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | JP20020040665 | 18.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002040665 | JP20020153157 | 27.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002153157 | JP20020321840 | 05.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002321840 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1336810 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1336810 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1336810 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/10, F01N7/08, F02M25/07, F02D21/08, F01N3/04 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
F28D7/106 (EP);
F01N3/0205 (EP);
F01N3/043 (EP);
F02M26/11 (EP);
F02M26/12 (EP);
F02M26/32 (EP);
F16L39/005 (EP);
F28F9/0219 (EP);
F01N13/08 (EP);
F01N13/1805 (EP);
F01N13/1838 (EP);
F01N2450/22 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/34] | F28D7/10, F01N7/08, F02M25/07, F02D21/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/32] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsstruktur von Rohren zu einer Flansch | [2003/34] | English: | Joining structure of piping to a flange | [2003/34] | French: | Structure de liaison de conduits sur une bride | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4142366 (TANAHASHI TOSHIO, et al) [X] 1* column 2, line 26 - line 37; figure 2 *; | [X]US5148675 (INMAN FREDERICK R [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 21; figures 6,7 *; | [X]WO0116468 (CUSTOM MARINE INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 12, line 3 - page 13, line 6; figures 1,1A *; | [X]WO0153666 (WESTERBEKE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 17; figures 8A,8B,9-13 * |