EP1333656 - Binding curvature correction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cariffe, Alan Eddy 12424 Kingspine Avenue San Diego, CA 92131 / US | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/32] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250488.8 | 28.01.2003 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | US20020062046 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: US 62046 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1333656 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1333656 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/387 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
H04N1/387 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/32] | H04N1/047, H04N1/387 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/01] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Korrektur der Krümmung von gebundenen Dokumenten | [2003/32] | English: | Binding curvature correction | [2003/32] | French: | La correction de la courbe due à la couverture | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5969795 (HONDA TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 8 * abstract * * figures 3,4,9-11 * * column 1, lines 45-62 * * claim 1 * [A] 1,7,9; | [XY] - WADA T ET AL, "SHAPE FROM SHADING WITH INTERREFLECTIONS UNDER A PROXIMAL LIGHT SOURCE: DISTORTION-FREE COPYING OF AN UNFOLDED BOOK", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NORWELL, US, (199709), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 0920-5691, pages 125 - 135, XP000703578 [X] 1,2,7,9 * abstract * * page 130, column 1, lines 11-23 * * page 132, paragraph 5.2 * * page 134, paragraph 7. * [Y] 3-5,8,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1007906904009 | [Y] - KRELL G ET AL, "An artificial neural network for real-time image restoration", INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1996. IMTC-96. CONFERENCE PROCEEEDINGS. QUALITY MEASUREMENTS: THE INDISPENSABLE BRIDGE BETWEEN THEORY AND REALITY., IEEE BRUSSELS, BELGIUM 4-6 JUNE 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19960604), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-3312-8, pages 833 - 838, XP010163993 [Y] 3-5,10 * abstract * * page 1, column 1, lines 22-24, paragraph 1 * * page 1, column 2, lines 16-19, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMTC.1996.507285 | [XY] - NAKAJIMA T ET AL, "Compensation of partly photographed page-images using 3D shape information", MULTIMEDIA COMPUTING AND SYSTEMS, 1999. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FLORENCE, ITALY 7-11 JUNE 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19990607), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7695-0253-9, pages 179 - 183, XP010342525 [X] 1,2,9 [Y] 3-5,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMCS.1999.778232 | [X] - BROWN M S ET AL, "Document restoration using 3D shape: a general deskewing algorithm for arbitrarily warped documents", IEEE, (20010707), vol. 2, pages 367 - 374, XP010554112 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 367, column 2, lines 31-39 * * page 368, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - IWAHORI Y ET AL, "CLASSIFICATION OF SURFACE CURVATURE FROM SHADING IMAGES USING NEURAL NETWORK", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION AND SYSTEMS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (199808), vol. E81-D, no. 8, ISSN 0916-8532, pages 889 - 900, XP000783206 [Y] 3-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * |