EP1333565 - Power conversion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VLT, Inc. 560, Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale, CA 94086-4049 / US | [2004/52] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states VLT CORPORATION 9901 I.H. 10 West, 8th Floor San Antonio, Texas 78230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vinciarelli, Patrizio 294 Beacon Street Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Deans, Michael John Percy M.J.P. Deans Lane End House Hookley Lane Elstead, Surrey GU8 6JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Deans, Michael John Percy M.J.P. Deans, Lane End House Hookley Lane Elstead Surrey GU8 6JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250639.6 | 31.01.2003 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | US20020066418 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: US 66418 | US20020264327 | 01.10.2002 Original published format: US 264327 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1333565 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1333565 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/337, H02M3/338 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
H02J1/102 (EP,US);
H02M1/08 (EP,US);
H02M3/003 (EP,US);
H02M3/01 (EP,US);
H02M3/28 (EP,US);
H02M3/285 (EP,US);
H02M3/33571 (EP,US);
H02M3/33573 (EP,US);
H02M3/33592 (EP,US);
H02M3/337 (EP,US);
H02M3/3376 (EP,US);
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/32] | H02M3/337 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/29] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stromwandlung | [2003/32] | English: | Power conversion | [2003/32] | French: | Conversion de puissance | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 04.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.03.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5559683 (SCHOENWALD DAVID S [US]) [Y] 6,7,16,17 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6061252 (HOSOTANI TATSUYA [JP]) [A] 1,8-11,18-20* column 8, line 20 - column 17, line 27; figures 1-27 *; | [XY] - ALVAREZ-BARCIA L ET AL, "Low power multioutput converter with post-regulation based on synchronous rectification and windings integrated in the PCB", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, 1998. APEC '98. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS 1998., THIRTEENTH ANNUAL ANAHEIM, CA, USA 15-19 FEB. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980215), ISBN 0-7803-4340-9, pages 191 - 197, XP010263594 [X] 1-3,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,16,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.1998.647691 | [A] - NAKAZAWA H ET AL, "MICRO-DC/DC CONVERTER THAT INTEGRATED PLANAR INDUCTOR ON POWER IC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200009), vol. 36, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 3518 - 3520, XP001020137 [A] 1,8,11,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.908880 |