EP1349129 - Remote controller with impact sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2011/08] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states Fanuc Ltd 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Yoshiki 299-40, Ochiai Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 257-0025 / JP | 02 /
Chino, Nobuo, Room 11-206, FANUC Manshonharimomi 3515-1, Shibokusa, Oshina-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi, 401-0511 / JP | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2003/40] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250955.6 | 17.02.2003 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | JP20020091128 | 28.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002091128 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1349129 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1349129 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349129 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G08C17/00 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
G08C17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/09] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fernsteuervorrichtung mit einem Aufprallsensor | [2003/40] | English: | Remote controller with impact sensor | [2003/40] | French: | Dispositif de télécommande avec capteur d'impact | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08102020.8 / EP1942476 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5212433 (YASUYUKI SHIMODA [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 25 * * column 2, line 4 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 58 - column 3, line 68; figure 2 *; | [A]JPH0843425 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0734817 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [Y]EP0944017 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1a,9,10 *; | [A]US6051894 (SHIMOGAMA SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |