EP1345253 - Semiconductor manufacturing equipment and maintenance method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASM JAPAN K.K. 23-1, 6-chome, Nagayama Tama-shi Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states ASM JAPAN K.K. 23-1, 6-chome, Nagayama Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagishi, Takayuki 23-1, 6-chome, Nagayama Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Takeshi 23-1, 6-chome, Nagayama Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | 03 /
Suwada, Masaei 23-1, 6-chome, Nagayama Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250994.5 | 18.02.2003 | [2003/38] | Priority number, date | JP20020044928 | 21.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002044928 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1345253 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1345253 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
H01L21/67196 (EP,US);
H01L21/68 (KR);
Y10S414/135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/49] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiter-Herstellungsvorrichtung und Wartungsverfahren | [2003/38] | English: | Semiconductor manufacturing equipment and maintenance method | [2003/38] | French: | Equipement pour la fabrication de semiconducteur et procédé d'entretien | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 05.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DPA]JP2002141293 ; | [A]US5611655 (FUKASAWA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US5762745 (HIROSE OSAMU [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 32 * * column 4, line 7 - column 8, line 64 *; | [A]US6235634 (WHITE JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1107288 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO0179090 (ASYST TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [DPA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002141293 A 20020517 (ASM JAPAN KK) [DPA] 1-10 * abstract * |