EP1349297 - A closed loop multiple antenna system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Jung-Tao 44 Center Grove Road, Apartment H71 Randolph, New Jersey 07981 / US | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2003/40] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03251635.3 | 18.03.2003 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | US20020112098 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: US 112098 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1349297 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/08 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
H04B7/0413 (EP,US);
H04B7/02 (KR);
H04B7/0615 (EP,US);
H04B7/0842 (EP,US);
H04B7/0619 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/26] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrfachantennensystem mit geschlossenem Regelkreis | [2003/40] | English: | A closed loop multiple antenna system | [2003/40] | French: | Système à plusieurs antennes à boucle fermée | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/29] | 28.05.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/29] | Appeal following examination | 11.05.2006 | Appeal received No. T1388/06 | 07.08.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.05.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | 13.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0905920 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [XD] 1-10 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 12; figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 49 - page 6, line 53 *; | [X]EP1133073 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 1 *; | [X]US2002034263 (SCHMIDL TIMOTHY [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 1, column R, paragraph 13 - page 4, column R, paragraph 56; figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [XP]EP1289169 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1-7* paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053]; figure 10; claim 5 *; | [X] - LO T K Y, "MAXIMUM RADIO TRANSMISSION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199910), vol. 47, no. 10, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 1458 - 1461, XP000868645 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.795811 |