EP1348981 - Distributed laser obstacle awareness system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC. 14300 Judicial Road Burnsville, MN 55306-4898 / US | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jamieson, James R. 8339 Carriage Hill Alcove Savage, MN 55378 / US | 02 /
Ray, Mark D. Box 215, 1619 W. County Road 42 Burnsville, MN 55306 / US | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Hartley, Andrew Philip, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Hartley, Andrew Philip, et al Mathisen, Macara & Co The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03251639.5 | 18.03.2003 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | US20020109372 | 28.03.2002 Original published format: US 109372 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1348981 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1348981 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/93, G01S7/486 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
G01S7/4818 (EP,US);
G01C23/005 (EP,US);
G01P5/26 (EP,US);
G01S17/58 (EP,US);
G01S17/933 (EP,US);
G01S7/4817 (EP,US);
G01S7/486 (EP,US);
G01S7/51 (EP,US);
B64D45/08 (EP,US);
G01S17/42 (EP,US);
G01S17/87 (EP,US);
G01S17/88 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/34] |
Former [2004/33] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verteiltes Laser- Hindernis- Detektionssystem | [2003/40] | English: | Distributed laser obstacle awareness system | [2003/40] | French: | Système distribué à laser pour détecter des obstacles | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 20.05.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/32] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4885589 (EDWARD BRIAN J [US], et al) [A] * column W *; | [A]US5172181 (MORBIEU BERTRAND [FR], et al) [A] * column 2, line 13 - line 22; figure 1 * * column 2, line 49 - line 60 *; | [X]EP0566027 (CARELLO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,7-10,12-17,20 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, lines 47,48 * * column 3, line 8 - line 13 * * column 3, line 21 - line 37 * * column 3, line 46 - line 53 * * column 4, line 1 - line 9 * * column 4, line 19 - line 38 *; | [PX]US2002157887 (SUGAWARA RYOICHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1-3,8-14 * figures 1,3,4,8 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0049] , [0053] *; | [E]WO03048804 (QINETIQ LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1,15 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - line 12 * * page 4, line 17 - line 24 * * page 5, line 9 - line 15 * * figures 2,3 * |