EP1349027 - Numerical control device for a machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAR MICRONICS CO., LTD. 20-10, Nakayoshida Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka / JP | [2010/45] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states STAR MICRONICS CO., LTD. 20-10, Nakayoshida Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endo, Nobuyuki, c/o Star Micronics Co., Ltd. 20-10, Nakayoshida Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Yazaki, Noriyuki, c/o Star Micronics Co., Ltd. 20-10, Nakayoshida Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Shinomiya, Katsuhiro, c/o Star Micronics Co., Ltd. 20-10, Nakayoshida Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03251893.8 | 26.03.2003 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | JP20020088506 | 27.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002088506 | JP20030043751 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003043751 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1349027 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1349027 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349027 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/19, G05B19/414, G05B19/18 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
G05B19/19 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/40] | G05B19/19 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/19] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Numerische Steuerung für ein Maschinenwerkzeug | [2003/40] | English: | Numerical control device for a machine tool | [2003/40] | French: | Commande numérique pour une machine-outil | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 19.02.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.06.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19934044 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-3* column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 12; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US6246201 (ADEREK ANDRZEJ [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 59; figures 2-6 * |