EP1462170 - Gas-phase chemical reactions using a molten metal catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROPEAN COMMUNITY 1049 Brussels / BE | [2004/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwards, Robert Arthur Henry via Milano 25 21027 Ispra (VA) / IT | 02 /
Burghartz, Stephan Maurice Marco Boris Alpen Blick Strasse 41 79761 Waldshuttiengen / DE | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Freylinger, Ernest T., et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Freylinger, Ernest T., et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 03251984.5 | 28.03.2003 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462170 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/12, B01J23/14, C01B3/32, C01B3/40, B01J10/00, B01J19/26, B01J19/10 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
B01J4/002 (EP);
B01J19/10 (EP);
B01J19/26 (EP);
B01J23/14 (EP);
B01J35/27 (EP);
C01B3/16 (EP);
C01B3/326 (EP);
C01B3/386 (EP);
C01B3/40 (EP);
B01B1/005 (EP);
B01J2219/00087 (EP);
C01B2203/00 (EP);
C01B2203/0233 (EP);
C01B2203/0261 (EP);
C01B2203/0283 (EP);
C01B2203/10 (EP);
C01B2203/1041 (EP);
C01B2203/1088 (EP);
C01B2203/1211 (EP);
C01B2203/1229 (EP);
C01B2203/1288 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chemische Reaktionen in der Gasphase unter Verwendung von geschmolzenem Metall als Katalysator | [2004/40] | English: | Gas-phase chemical reactions using a molten metal catalyst | [2004/40] | French: | Réactions chimiques en phase vapeur catalysées par un métal fondu | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.05.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3545962 (THEMELIS NICKOLAS J, et al) [X] 1-5,10,11,14-19,24-28 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 23 *; | [X]US3821362 (SPACIL H) [X] 1-12,14-20,23-28,30 * the whole document *; | [X]US3979505 (SEITZER WALTER H) [X] 1-12,14-20,23-28,30* the whole document *; | [X]US4126668 (ERICKSON DONALD C) [X] 1-12,14-20,24-28,30 * column 1, line 31 - line 42 * * column 5, line 9 - line 20 * * column 6, line 3 - line 15 *; | [X]US4216199 (ERICKSON DONALD C [US]) [X] 1-12,14-20,24-28,30 * column 2, line 51 - line 66 * * column 4, line 33 - line 34 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 20 * * claims 2,3,13 *; | [X]WO02070403 (ALCHEMIX CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-20,24-28 * page 2, line 19 - page 4, line 5 * * page 18, line 24 - page 19, line 34 * |