EP1369552 - Structural cover for gas turbine engine bolted flanges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/26] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niday, David Andrew 165 Cold Springs Court Springboro, Ohio 45066 / US | 02 /
Ryczek, Scott Patrick 499 Clemray Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45231 / US | 03 /
McGovern, James Patrick 100 Village Street Marblehead, Massachusetts 01945 / US | 04 /
Liotta, Gary Charles 1 Clark Avenue Beverly, Massachusetts 01915 / US | 05 /
Busso, Gianni 21 Pomeroy Street Allston, Massachusetts 02134 / US | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2003/50] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252064.5 | 01.04.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | US20020164954 | 06.06.2002 Original published format: US 164954 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1369552 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1369552 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1369552 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/02, F01D5/08 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
F02C7/22 (EP,US);
F01D11/001 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F01D5/08 (EP,US);
F01D9/00 (EP,US);
F01D9/04 (EP,US);
F02C7/20 (EP,US);
F23R3/286 (EP,US);
F23R3/343 (EP,US);
F05D2240/14 (EP,US);
F05D2260/97 (EP,US);
F23D2900/00018 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/29] |
Former [2003/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schutzhaube für Flanschverbindungen in Gasturbinen | [2003/50] | English: | Structural cover for gas turbine engine bolted flanges | [2003/50] | French: | Couvercle pour brides de turbines à gaz | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3383033 (MOORE CLINTON C) [X] 1,5,8 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 31 * * figure - *; | [Y]EP0482791 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 2-4,6,7,9,10 * column 5, line 44 - column 7, line 17 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0513956 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US5402636 (MIZE CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5522698 (BUTLER AARON S [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 23 * * figure - *; | [X]EP0926315 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,5,8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014]; figure - *; | [XY]US6095750 (ROSS STEVEN A [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 36 * * figure - * [Y] 2-4,6,7,9,10 |