EP1353393 - Electrochemical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB | [2014/13] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Eveready Battery Company, Inc. 533 Maryville University Drive St Louis, MO 64141 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gore, Makarand P. 1210 NE Conroy Place Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2014/13] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2011/02] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/12] | Rees, Simon John Lewis, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/42] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252107.2 | 02.04.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | US20020120864 | 10.04.2002 Original published format: US 120864 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1353393 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1353393 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1353393 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/90, H01M10/48, H01M8/04, H01M8/22, H01M12/08, // H01M4/86 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
H01M8/04216 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M10/488 (EP,KR,US);
H01M12/08 (EP,US);
H01M4/9016 (EP,US);
H01M4/9041 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04208 (EP,US);
H01M8/22 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2004/8684 (EP,US);
H01M2004/8689 (EP,US);
H01M8/04186 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/42] | H01M8/06, H01M8/22, H01M12/08, G01N27/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2016/27] |
Former [2006/40] | DE, FR, NL | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrochemische Vorrichtung | [2003/42] | English: | Electrochemical device | [2003/42] | French: | Dispositif électrochmique | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 26.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.07.2016 | [2017/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH11339865 ; | [YA]US4397925 (MAGAHED EL-SAYED A) [Y] 6-11,16-21 * column 1, lines 6-39 * [A] 1-5,12-15; | [XY]US5804329 (AMENDOLA STEVEN [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, lines 59-61 * * column 2, lines 50-52 * * column 5, lines 32-52 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 13 * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 38 * [Y] 6-21; | [A]US6074771 (CUBUKCU ESIN [US], et al) [A] 1-21* column 5, lines 15-38 *; | [DYA]US6307605 (BAILEY JOHN C [US]) [DY] 12-21 * abstract * * column 2, lines 39-61 * [A] 1-11 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11339865 A 19991210 (SONY CORP) [Y] 6-11,16-21 * abstract * [A] 1-5,12-15 |