EP1364765 - Injection molding machine with compensation of bending moment on stationary platen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Fanuc Ltd. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Uamanashi, 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshioka, Mitsushi 3777-1, Hirano, Yamanakakomura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi, 401-0502 / JP | [2005/36] |
Former [2003/48] | 01 /
Yoshioka, Mitsushi 3777-1, Hirano, Yamamnakakomura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi, 401-0502 / JP | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252283.1 | 10.04.2003 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | JP20020149514 | 23.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002149514 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364765 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1364765 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/17 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
B29C45/1744 (EP,US);
B29C45/1777 (EP,US);
B29C2045/1792 (EP,US);
B29C45/1761 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2004/34] |
Former [2003/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spritzgiessmaschine mit biegemomentfreier feststehender Aufspannplatte | [2003/48] | English: | Injection molding machine with compensation of bending moment on stationary platen | [2003/48] | French: | Machine de moulage par injection avec plateau de serrage de moule immobile dépourvu de moment de flexion | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05009448.1 / EP1574314 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH06134808 ; | [A]JPH06339945 ; | [A]JP2001239561 ; | [X]US2266129 (TEGARTY JOHN B) [X] 6-9 * page 2, column L, line 24 - line 27 * * page 3, column L, line 41 - line 43; figure 1 *; | [X]DE2431585 (4 P VERPACKUNGEN GMBH, et al) [X] 5-9 * page 9, line 16; figure 1 * * page 13, line 15 *; | [XY]EP1078728 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * column 6, line 27 - line 38 * * column 7, line 4 - line 6; figures 5,6 * [Y] 2,4-9; | [Y]US6354829 (KOIDE ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 48 - line 49 * * column 3, line 13 - line 21; figure 4 * | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940815), vol. 018, no. 435, Database accession no. (M - 1655), & JP06134808 A 19940517 (SUMITOMO JUKIKAI PLAST MACH KK;OTHERS: 01) [YD] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, & JP06339945 A 19941213 (TOYO MACH & METAL CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001239561 A 20010904 (TOSHIBA MACH CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |