EP1354713 - Image printing using print quality enhancing ink [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Satoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Yuko c/o Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252375.5 | 15.04.2003 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | JP20020112888 | 16.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002112888 | JP20020252771 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002252771 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1354713 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1354713 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1354713 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/21 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
B41J2/17566 (EP,US);
B41J2/2114 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/43] | Title | German: | Bilddrucken unter Verwendung einer druckqualitätsverbessernden Flüssigkeit | [2003/43] | English: | Image printing using print quality enhancing ink | [2003/43] | French: | Procédé d'impression d'image utilisant une liquide améliorant la qualité d'impression | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.2008 | BE | 22.10.2008 | CY | 22.10.2008 | CZ | 22.10.2008 | DK | 22.10.2008 | EE | 22.10.2008 | FI | 22.10.2008 | IT | 22.10.2008 | NL | 22.10.2008 | RO | 22.10.2008 | SI | 22.10.2008 | SK | 22.10.2008 | TR | 22.10.2008 | BG | 22.01.2009 | SE | 22.01.2009 | GR | 23.01.2009 | ES | 02.02.2009 | PT | 23.03.2009 | IE | 15.04.2009 | LU | 15.04.2009 | HU | 23.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
GR | 23.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LU | 15.04.2009 | ||
HU | 23.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
GR | 23.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LU | 15.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
GR | 23.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 02.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH01114450 ; | [XA]EP0703087 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,5 * page 8, lines 13-49; figures 5-7 * [A] 2,4,6; | [XA]EP0845356 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,5 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 10 * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 42; figures 3-7 * [A] 2,4,6 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890727), vol. 013, no. 335, Database accession no. (M - 856), & JP01114450 A 19890508 (CANON INC) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * [A] 2,4,6 |