EP1354735 - Vehicle air conditioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei UK Limited Llethri Road Llanelli Carmarthenshire SA14 8HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei UK Limited Llethri Road Llanelli, Carmarthenshire SA14 8HU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Gwyn Talarwen, Furnace Llanelli, Carmarthenshire SA15 4RY / GB | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252431.6 | 16.04.2003 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | GB20020008770 | 16.04.2002 Original published format: GB 0208770 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1354735 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
B60H1/00542 (EP,US);
B60H1/3226 (EP,US);
B60H1/32281 (EP,US);
B60H1/3229 (EP);
B60H2001/00214 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/29] |
Former [2003/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2003/43] | English: | Vehicle air conditioning system | [2003/43] | French: | Dispositif de climatisation pour véhicule | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 23.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 05.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4217764 (ARMBRUSTER JOSEPH M [US]) [X] 1,8 * column 1, line 25 - column 5, line 64; figures 3,4 *; | [XA]US5222372 (DEREES DELBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9 * column 1, line 55 - column 4, line 40; figure 3 * [A] 6,10; | [A]US2001027663 (ZEIGLER TERRY A [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0048]; figure 5 *; | [A]WO0188454 (LLANELLI RADIATORS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 3,9* page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 29; figure 5 * |