EP1356789 - Intraluminal medical device with radiopaque markers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gladdish, Bennie, W. Jr. 1840 S.W. 131st Terrace Davie, FL 33325 / US | 02 /
Nino, Marco 18969 N.W. 63 Ct. circle Miami, FL 33015 / US | 03 /
Shaw, William D. Jr. 20150 N.E. 3rd Court No. 8 Miami, FL 33179 / US | 04 /
Sijbolts, Durk C 44619 Parkmeadow Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 05 /
Vaughan, Dennis B 1155 N.W. 133rd Street N. Miami, FL 33168 / US | [2007/27] |
Former [2003/44] | 01 /
Gladdish, Bennie, W. 1840 S.W. 131st Terrace Davie, FL 33325 / US | ||
02 /
Nino, Marco 18969 N.W. 63 Ct. circle Miami, FL 33015 / US | |||
03 /
Shaw, William D. Jr. 20150 N.E. 3rd Court No. 8 Miami, FL 33179 / US | |||
04 /
Sijbolts, Durk C 44619 Parkmeadow Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | |||
05 /
Vaughan, Dennis B 1155 N.W. 133rd Street N. Miami, FL 33168 / US | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252530.5 | 22.04.2003 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | US20020127191 | 22.04.2002 Original published format: US 127191 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1356789 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1356789 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/82 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61L31/022 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/18 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91533 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91558 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0098 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, C08L27/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/44] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/44] | Title | German: | Intraluminale medizinische Vorrichtung mit radiopaken Markern | [2007/10] | English: | Intraluminal medical device with radiopaque markers | [2003/44] | French: | Dispositif médical intraluminal à marquers radio-opaques | [2003/44] |
Former [2003/44] | Intraluminale medizinische Vorrichtung mit radiopaken Markierungen | Examination procedure | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2008 | CY | 19.03.2008 | CZ | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | TR | 19.03.2008 | LU | 22.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | ES | 30.06.2008 | PT | 26.08.2008 | HU | 20.09.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
TR | 19.03.2008 | ||
LU | 22.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
LU | 22.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
LU | 22.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9733534 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [Y] 11,19 * page 2, line 25 - page 7, line 7 ** figures 1-12 *; | [XY]WO0226281 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [X] 1-10,12-18 * page 45, line 21 - page 56, line 14 * * figures 16-18 * [Y] 11,19; | [PX]WO02078762 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [PX] 1-19 * page 10, line 25 - page 21, line 20 * * figures 7-9 * | by applicant | US4655771 | US4733665 | US5632771 | US5725572 | US5741327 | US5800526 | US6022374 |