EP1357194 - Adapter for the connection of a biosensor to a measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniike, Yuko 3-1-10, Kawarayamachi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0066 / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Shin 2-5-16-205, Fujigao Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0022 / JP | 03 /
Yoshioka, Toshihiko 15-15-307, Takatsukacho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0035 / JP | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Bradley, Josephine Mary, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Bradley, Josephine Mary, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252578.4 | 24.04.2003 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | JP20020126810 | 26.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002126810 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1357194 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1357194 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N27/28, G01N27/30 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/005 (EP,US);
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
G01N27/3273 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/39] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | adapter zur verbindung eines biosensors mit einem messgerät | [2004/01] | English: | Adapter for the connection of a biosensor to a measuring device | [2003/44] | French: | adaptateur pour la connection d'un capteur biologique avec un dispositif de mesure | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/44] | Adapter zur verbindung eines Biosensors mit einem Messgerät | ||
Former [2003/44] | Adaptateur pour la connection d'un capteur biologique avec un dispositif de mesure | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH11248667 ; | [Y]JPH1183787 ; | [A]JPH09159642 ; | [A]EP1065501 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 34-50* figures 4,6 *; | [XAY]EP1172649 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 34-38 * column 5, lines 1-4 * * abstract * [A] 1-33,38-50 [Y] 34-38 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11248667 A 19990917 (NOK CORP) [Y] 34-38 * abstract * [A] 1-33 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11083787 A 19990326 (NOK CORP) [Y] 34-38 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09159642 A 19970620 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-50 * abstract * |