EP1471217 - Deflector for limiting the ingress of liquid oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perkins Engines Company Limited Eastfield Peterborough PE1 5NA / GB | [2007/13] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Perkins Engines Company Limited Vicarage Farm Road Office, Eastfield Peterborough, PE1 5NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bedkowski, Maciej 28 Dorchester Crescent Petersborough, PE1 4RP / GB | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252616.2 | 25.04.2003 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471217 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471217 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01M13/04 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
F01M13/0416 (EP,US);
F01M2013/0433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/29] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ablenkplatte zur Verhinderung der Ansaugung von flüssigem Öl | [2004/44] | English: | Deflector for limiting the ingress of liquid oil | [2004/44] | French: | Déflecteur pour limiter l'entrée d'huile liquide | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 28.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 01.11.2007 | [2008/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0996209 ; | [X]JP2000045750 ; | [A]JPH03107517 ; | [A]EP1233155 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,7,8* column 3, lines 10-35; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO03025354 (YANMAR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8 * figures 1-4,8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09096209 A 19970408 (TENETSUKUSU:KK) [X] 1,3,7,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000045750 A 20000215 (UCHIYAMA MFG CORP) [X] 1,3,7,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910725), vol. 015, no. 294, Database accession no. (M - 1140), & JP03107517 A 19910507 (KUBOTA CORP) [A] 1,3,7,8 * abstract * |