EP1359430 - Spatial encoding mr data of a moving subject using a higher-order gradient field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | [2010/03] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hinks, Richard Scott W226 N174 Takoma Drive Waukesha, Wisconsin 53186 / US | 02 /
King, Kevin F. 15651 West Ridge Road New Berlin, Wisconsin 53151 / US | 03 /
Polzin, Jason A. 140 Franklin Street Lake Mills, Wisconsin 53551 / US | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Bedford, Grant Richard GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2003/45] | Goode, Ian Roy GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252643.6 | 25.04.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | US20020063507 | 01.05.2002 Original published format: US 63507 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1359430 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1359430 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359430 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/563 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
G01R33/56375 (EP,US);
G01R33/385 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2005/52] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Räumliche Kodierung von MR-Daten an einem sich bewegenden Objekt unter Verwendung eines Gradientenfeldes höherer Ordnung | [2003/45] | English: | Spatial encoding mr data of a moving subject using a higher-order gradient field | [2003/45] | French: | Codage spatial des données RM d'un objet mobile en utilisant un champ de gradient d'ordre supérieur | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4651098 (YAMADA YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 3,4 * column 7, line 33 - line 64; figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1024371 (MARCONI ELECTRONIC SYST LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] - [0040]; claim 1 *; | [PX]US2002147395 (HEID OLIVER [DE]) [PX] 1-10* claims 1-3 *; | [XA] - KRUGER D G ET AL, "Continuously moving table data acquisition method for long FOV contrast-enhanced MRA and whole-body MRI", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (200202), vol. 47, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 224 - 231, XP002290063 [X] 9 * chapter "Materials and Methods" * [A] 1-8,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.10061 | [PX] - HINKS R.S. ET AL, "Motion-Induced Spatial Encoding Using A Quadratic Gradient Field", ISMRM TENTH MEETING PROCEEDINGS, HONOLULU,HI,USA, (20020518), XP002315851 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | - KRUGER D. G. ET AL., MRM, (2002), vol. 47, pages 224 - 231 |