EP1367590 - Music recording/reproducing apparatus, list generation method, and information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | For all designated states Tech Experts Incorporation No. 15-5 Ohmorinishi 4-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | ||
For all designated states Tech Experts Incorporation No. 15-5 Ohmorinishi 4-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nonaka, Yoshiya, Pioneer Corporation No. 25-1 Aza-Nishicho, Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Sugino, Ryoji, c/o Pioneer Corporation No. 15-5 Ohmorinishi 4-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2007/05] |
Former [2003/49] | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252700.4 | 29.04.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | JP20020158792 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002158792 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1367590 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1367590 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/034, G11B27/10, G11B27/32, G11B27/11, G11B27/34, G11B19/02, G11B20/10 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
G11B19/02 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2529 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/41 (EP,US);
G11B2220/61 (EP,US);
G11B2220/65 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/49] | G11B27/034, G11B20/10, G11B27/10, G11B27/34, G11B19/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/22] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ton Aufzeichnungs/Wiedergabegerät, Verfahren zur Erstellung von einer Liste und Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium | [2003/49] | English: | Music recording/reproducing apparatus, list generation method, and information recording medium | [2003/49] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement/reproduction de musique, procédé de génération d'une liste et milieu d'enregistrement d'informations | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/13] | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5751672 (YANKOWSKI CARL J [US]) [A] 2,8,10* column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 56 *; | [X]EP0962929 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0016] , [0027] - [0029] - [0031] , [0035] , [0038] , [0041] - [0050] - [0052] , [0060] , [0061] , [0064] , [0066] , [0068] * * paragraphs [0070] , [0072] , [0076] - [0078] - [0103] - [0106] - [0114] , [0116]; figures 1-3,5 *; | [A]US6061680 (SCHERF STEVEN DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 2,8,10 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 59 *; | [A]WO0128222 (PERCEPTION DIGITAL TECHNOLOGY [VG], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 5, lines 15-19 * * page 5, line 23 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 2 * * page 13, line 31 - page 14, line 5 * * page 13, line 23 - page 15, line 11 * * page 15, line 12 - page 16, line 6 * * page 27, line 30 - page 28, line 3 * * page 27, line 15 - page 30, line 16 * * page 30, line 1 - page 32, line 29 * * page 31, lines 8-14 * * page 31, line 29 - page 32, line 2 * * page 32, lines 25-29 * |