EP1366960 - Energy absorbing composite tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEXCEL CORPORATION 11711 Dublin Boulevard Dublin California 94568 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Hexcel Corporation 11711 Dublin Boulevard Dublin, California 94568 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thayer, Christopher M. 5948 Corte Cerritos Pleasanton, California 94566 / US | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Wilson Gunn M'Caw 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253151.9 | 20.05.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | US20020159653 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: US 159653 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1366960 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1366960 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/34, F16F7/12 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
F16F7/127 (EP,US);
B60R19/34 (EP,US);
F16F7/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/49] | Title | German: | Energieverzehrendes, rohrförmiges Verbundmaterial | [2003/49] | English: | Energy absorbing composite tube | [2003/49] | French: | Matériau composite tubulaire pour l'absorption d'énérgie | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.2006
06.02.2006
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Stolmár, Martina Dahlienstrasse 3 82152 Krailing / DE Opponent's representative Hofmann, Matthias, et al, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.2006
06.02.2006
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Stolmár, Martina Dahlienstrasse 3 82152 Krailing / DE Opponent's representative Hofmann, Matthias, et al, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2006/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.2006
Dr. Stolmár, Martina Berchernstr. 19 82152 Krailing / DE Opponent's representative Hofmann, Matthias, et al, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | 30.03.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.07.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.11.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2005 | BE | 13.04.2005 | CH | 13.04.2005 | CZ | 13.04.2005 | EE | 13.04.2005 | ES | 13.04.2005 | FI | 13.04.2005 | IT | 13.04.2005 | LI | 13.04.2005 | NL | 13.04.2005 | RO | 13.04.2005 | SI | 13.04.2005 | SK | 13.04.2005 | TR | 13.04.2005 | CY | 20.05.2005 | IE | 20.05.2005 | LU | 20.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | BG | 13.07.2005 | DK | 13.07.2005 | GR | 13.07.2005 | SE | 13.07.2005 | HU | 14.07.2005 | PT | 13.09.2005 | GB | 20.05.2007 | [2008/26] |
Former [2007/41] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
EE | 13.04.2005 | ||
ES | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
IT | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
RO | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
CY | 20.05.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
LU | 20.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
HU | 14.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
EE | 13.04.2005 | ||
ES | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
IT | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
CY | 20.05.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
LU | 20.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
HU | 14.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
EE | 13.04.2005 | ||
ES | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
CY | 20.05.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
LU | 20.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
HU | 14.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
EE | 13.04.2005 | ||
ES | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
CY | 20.05.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
LU | 20.05.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
HU | 14.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
EE | 13.04.2005 | ||
ES | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
CY | 20.05.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
LU | 13.06.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
HU | 14.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
EE | 13.04.2005 | ||
ES | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
LU | 13.06.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
HU | 14.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
EE | 13.04.2005 | ||
ES | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
LU | 13.06.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
IE | 20.05.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 13.04.2005 | |
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 13.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6217438 ; | [XY]FR2528928 (PICAND ROLAND [FR]) [X] 1,5,7,10,12,13,17,22,23,27,31 * page 6, line 29 - page 8, line 15; figures 1-3; claims 7,8 * [Y] 3,4,6,8,9,11,14,18,19,21,24,29,30,32; | [A]GB2134211 (NAT RES DEV) [A] 1,7,17,27* the whole document *; | [AY]FR2657130 (DOMANGE JARRET [FR]) [A] 1,7,17,27 * page 4, line 2 - page 6, line 33 * * page 12, lines 25-30; figures 1-5 * [Y] 14,24; | [Y]DE4425829 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AG [DE]) [Y] 6,11,21,32 * column 2, lines 48-62 *; | [A] - SHAW M C, "designs for safety:the mechanical fuse: energy absorbed by metal cu", MECHANICAL ENGINEERING, ASME. NEW YORK, US, (197204), vol. 4, no. 4, ISSN 0025-6501, XP002135776 [A] 1,7,17,27 * column 3, paragraph 2 - column 4, paragraph 2; figure 3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870619), vol. 011, no. 191, Database accession no. (M - 600), & JP62017438 A 19870126 (NIPPON KOUKUUKI KAIHATSU KYOKAI) [Y] 3,4,8,9,18,19,29,30 * abstract * |