EP1367453 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Atsushi c/o Konica Corporation, 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hata, Yoshihiro c/o Konica Corporation, 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Brown, George Laurence Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Brown, George Laurence Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2003/49] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253208.7 | 22.05.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | JP20020152307 | 27.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002152307 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1367453 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1367453 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
G03G15/5016 (EP,US);
G03G21/1661 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1687 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/32] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät | [2003/49] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [2003/49] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/50] | 15.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4275941 (OGASAWARA TSUTOMU, et al) [Y] 2-7 * column 2; figure - *; | [XY]US5141196 (ARNOLD GREGORY B [US], et al) [X] 1 * columns 2,3; figure - * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]US5870647 (NADA MINORU [JP], et al) [Y] 8-15* figure - * |