EP1376457 - A method, system and computer program product for personalising the functionality of a personal communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sairanen, Jarkko Miniatontie 10 E 02360 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Vänskä, Marko Nuolihaukantie 16 A 02620 Espoo / FI | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253233.5 | 23.05.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | US20020179237 | 26.06.2002 Original published format: US 179237 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376457 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1376457 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06K17/00, H04Q7/32 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
G06K17/0022 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/029 (US);
G08B2001/085 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | G06K17/00, H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | 29.06.2004 | LT | 29.06.2004 | LV | 29.06.2004 | MK | 29.06.2004 | Title | German: | Verfahren, System und Computerprogrammprodukt zur Personalisierung der Funktionen eines persönlichen Kommunikationsgerätes | [2004/01] | English: | A method, system and computer program product for personalising the functionality of a personal communication device | [2004/01] | French: | Dispositif, procédé et produit logiciel pour la personnalisation des fonctions d'un appareil personnel de communication | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2006 | BE | 28.06.2006 | CH | 28.06.2006 | CY | 28.06.2006 | CZ | 28.06.2006 | EE | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | LI | 28.06.2006 | RO | 28.06.2006 | SI | 28.06.2006 | SK | 28.06.2006 | TR | 28.06.2006 | BG | 28.09.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | HU | 29.12.2006 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CY | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0174011 (PSION PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-24 * page 2, lines 1-11 ** page 4, line 5 - page 10, line 7 *; | [A]WO0175815 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,19,21-24 * page 1, line 17 - page 7, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2002039909 (RANKIN PAUL J [GB]) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0069] * * figure 1 *; | [PX]US2003030542 (VON HOFFMANN GERARD [US]) [PX] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0010] , [0031]; figures 1,2 * |