EP1367414 - Electrostatic machine element, light diffraction modulation element and image display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taguchi, Ayumu, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tamada, Hitoshi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr., et al D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253299.6 | 27.05.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | JP20020153962 | 28.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002153962 | JP20030146968 | 23.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003146968 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1367414 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1367414 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18, G02B26/08 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
G02B26/0841 (EP,US);
G02B26/00 (KR);
G02B26/0808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/35] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrostatisches Machinenelement, Modulationselement für Lichtdiffraktion und Bildanzeigevorrichtung | [2003/49] | English: | Electrostatic machine element, light diffraction modulation element and image display device | [2003/49] | French: | Elément électrostatique de machine, élément de modulation de diffraction de la lumière et dispositif d' affichage d' image | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5459610 (BLOOM DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1-17* column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 39; figures 8-11 *; | [DA]US5841579 (BLOOM DAVID M [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * column 4, line 41 - column 8, line 17; figure 5 *; | [DA]US6144481 (KOWARZ MAREK W [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * column 4, line 12 - column 6, line 38; figures 2-7 *; | [A]US6233087 (HAWKINS GILBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 7, line 11 - column 8, line 50; figures 4-6 * |