EP1447744 - Exclusive prefetch of a block of data from memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IP-First LLC 1045 Mission Court Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2004/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hooker, Rodney E. 9408 Big View Drive Austin, Texas 78730 / US | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al Haseltine Lake Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253513.0 | 04.06.2003 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | US20030364919 | 11.02.2003 Original published format: US 364919 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1447744 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1447744 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1447744 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F12/08, G06F9/318 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
G06F9/383 (EP,US);
G06F12/0815 (EP,US);
G06F12/0862 (EP,US);
G06F9/3004 (EP,US);
G06F9/30043 (EP,US);
G06F9/30047 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/34] | G06F9/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/30] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Exklusive Vorausladung eines Datenblocks aus einem Speicher | [2004/34] | English: | Exclusive prefetch of a block of data from memory | [2004/34] | French: | Préextraction exclusive d'un bloc de données d'une mémoire | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 11.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0947919 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0014] , [0024] , [0026] , [0030] *; | [E]EP1353267 (IP FIRST LLC [US]) [E] 1-12* paragraphs [0014] , [0033] , [0035] *; | [A] - TULLSEN D M ET AL, "EFFECTIVE CACHE PRFETCHING ON BUS-BASED MULTIPROCESSORS", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER SYSTEMS, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY. NEW YORK, US, (19950201), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 0734-2071, pages 57 - 88, XP000522390 [A] 1-12 * page 61, line 31 - line 35 * * page 81, line 3 - page 82, line 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/200912.201006 | [A] - TODD MOWRY ET AL, "TOLERATING LATENCY THROUGH SOFTWARE-CONTROLLED PREFETCHING IN SHARED-MEMORY MULTIPROCESSORS", JOURNAL OF PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (19910601), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 0743-7315, pages 87 - 106, XP000227966 [A] 1-12 * page 89, column L, line 28 - column R, line 1 * * paragraph [4.2.5] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0743-7315(91)90014-Z |