EP1400983 - Collimation system for dual slice electron beam tomography scanner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | [2013/33] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rand, Roy E. 1028 McGregor Way Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/33] |
Former [2013/27] | Bedford, Grant Richard Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2004/13] | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253606.2 | 06.06.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | US20020064182 | 19.06.2002 Original published format: US 64182 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1400983 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1400983 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | [2009/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1400983 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G21K1/02, A61B6/03 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
A61B6/4028 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
G21K1/025 (EP,US);
A61B6/06 (EP,US);
A61B6/4085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/13] | G21K1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2010/09] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kollimatorvorrichtung zum Einsatz in einem Zweischicht ElektronenstrahlScanner | [2004/13] | English: | Collimation system for dual slice electron beam tomography scanner | [2004/13] | French: | Dispositif de collimation pour scanner de tomographie à rayons d'électrons à double coupe | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 29.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4352021 (BOYD DOUGLAS P, et al) [A] 6,8,10 * column 4, lines 32-40 ** column 5, lines 12-24 *; | [X]US4610021 (PESCHMANN KRISTIAN R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 47; figures 3,4A-D,5,6A-D *; | [A]US5442673 (RAND ROY E [US], et al) [A] 2-5,9 * column 1, lines 55-57 * * column 3, line 14 - column 6, line 42; figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO0065333 (QUANTA VISION INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US5222114 | US6094469 |