EP1462122 - A process of making a hemostatic wound dressing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/40] | Hemostatic wound dressings and methods of making same | ||
[2010/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S.Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2011/15] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Ethicon, Inc. U.S.Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Looney, Dwayne Lee 31 North Main Street Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | 02 /
Guo, Jian Xin 34 Wexford Way Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 03 /
Zhang, Guanghui 4 Millers Grove Road Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 04 /
Pendharkar, Sanyog Manohar 9 Larch Drive Old Bridge, NJ 08857 / US | 05 /
Gorman, Anne Jessica 314 Stockton Street Highstown, NJ 08807 / US | 06 /
Craven, Thomas Lee 21 Filed Street Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 07 /
Bermel, Michelle 2937 Windsor Avenue Willow Grove, PA 19090 / US | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254091.6 | 27.06.2003 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | US20030396226 | 25.03.2003 Original published format: US 396226 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462122 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462122 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/28, A61L15/24, C08L1/04 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
A61L15/425 (EP,US);
A61L15/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61L15/64 (EP,US);
A61L27/20 (EP,US);
C08L1/04 (EP,US);
C08L1/16 (EP,US);
C08L1/284 (EP,US);
D04B21/16 (EP,US);
A61L2400/04 (EP,US);
C08L5/08 (EP,US);
D10B2509/022 (EP,US);
D10B2509/08 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2525 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/28, C08L1/02 (US,EP);
A61L15/28, C08L1/04 (US,EP);
A61L15/28, C08L1/24 (EP,US);
A61L15/28, C08L5/00 (US,EP);
A61L27/20, C08L1/04 (EP,US);
C08L1/04, C08L2666/26 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines hämostatischen Wundverbandes | [2010/39] | English: | A process of making a hemostatic wound dressing | [2010/39] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un pansement hémostatique pour blessures | [2010/39] |
Former [2004/40] | Hämostatischer Wundverband und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | ||
Former [2004/40] | Hemostatic wound dressings and methods of making same | ||
Former [2004/40] | Pansement hémostatique pour blessures et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2011 | BE | 13.04.2011 | CY | 13.04.2011 | CZ | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HU | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | IE | 27.06.2011 | LU | 27.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 16.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2914444 (SMITH DAVID F) [X] 1-7 * column 12, line 15 - line 62 *; | [Y]GB983073 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON) [Y] 1-22 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 37 * *claims*; | [Y]US3328259 (ANDERSON ROBERT J) [Y] 1-22 * column 4, line 23 - line 39 * * column 5, line 41 - line 51 * *claims*; | [X]EP0815879 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 2 * * examples 6,7 * *claims*; | [Y]GB2314840 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US]) [Y] 1-22 * page 3, line 1 - line 16 * * page 6, line 3 - line 26 * *claims* *examples*; | [X]US6500777 (WISEMAN DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 4, line 24 - line 60 * * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 15 * *claims*; | [E]EP1378255 (ETHICON INC [US]) [E] 1-22* the whole document * | by applicant | US2914444 | EP0815879 | US6500777 | US20020186021 |