EP1403178 - Pedal systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Butterworth, Paul John 1 Bampton Avenue Chard Somerset TA20 1DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Butterworth, Paul John 1 Bampton Avenue Chard, Somerset TA20 1DS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Brown, Michael Stanley Alpha & Omega Chine Croft East Hill Ottery St. Mary, Devon EX11 1PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Brown, Michael Stanley Alpha and Omega, Chine Croft, East Hill Ottery St. Mary, Devon EX11 1PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254367.0 | 10.07.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | GB20020015952 | 10.07.2002 Original published format: GB 0215952 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403178 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62M3/08 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
B62M3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/52] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pedalsystemen | [2004/14] | English: | Pedal systems | [2004/14] | French: | Systèmes de pédale | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/26] | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US363522 (KNOUS J) [A] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]US2749771 (PEARL DANIEL M) [X] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 8 *; | [X]US5197353 (TRENERRY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 10 *; | [X]US5199324 (SAIN CHARLES J [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 34 * * column 5, line 36 - line 59 *; | [PX]WO03026746 (ROGOZINSKI JOSEPH [IL]) [PX] 1* page 10, line 1 - page 17, line 3 * |