EP1383082 - Interpolated image filtering method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha Wisconsin 53188 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Avinash, Gopal B. 4915 South Radisson Court New Berlin, Wisconsin 53151 / US | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254372.0 | 10.07.2003 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | US20020193564 | 11.07.2002 Original published format: US 193564 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1383082 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
G06T3/4007 (EP,US);
G06T5/20 (EP,US);
G06T5/70 (EP,US);
G06T5/73 (EP,US);
G06T7/13 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10088 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Filterung interpolierter Bilder | [2004/04] | English: | Interpolated image filtering method and apparatus | [2004/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de filtrage d'image interpolée | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |