EP1424697 - Common bit/common source line high density 1T1R resistive-ram array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Sheng Teng 2216 NW Trout Court Camas WA 98607 / US | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254605.3 | 24.07.2003 | [2004/23] | Priority number, date | US20020306644 | 26.11.2002 Original published format: US 306644 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1424697 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1424697 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1424697 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/34, G11C7/18, G11C11/16 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
G11C13/0007 (EP,US);
G11C11/15 (KR);
G11C13/0069 (EP,US);
G11C7/18 (EP,US);
G11C2013/009 (EP,US);
G11C2213/31 (EP,US);
G11C2213/79 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/23] | G11C7/18, G11C11/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/49] |
Former [2004/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochdichte 1T1R resistive RAM-Speichermatrix mit einer gemeinsamen Bitleitung und einer gemeinsamen Sourceleitung | [2010/48] | English: | Common bit/common source line high density 1T1R resistive-ram array | [2004/23] | French: | Cellules mémoires résistives à accès aléatoire 1T1R à haute densité comprenant une ligne source commune et une ligne de bit commune | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/23] | Hochdichte 1T1R resistive RAM-Speichermatrix mit einer gemeinsamer Bitleitung und einer gemeinsamer Sourceleitung | Examination procedure | 16.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 17.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6314014 (LOWREY TYLER [US], et al); | [A]US2002051383 (MANGAN JOHN S [US], et al); | [A]DE10153560 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US2002131299 (YAMAZOE TAKANORI [JP], et al); | [A]US2002167843 (HSIA STEVE K [US], et al); | [PA]US2003003675 (HSU SHENG TENG [US]); | [E]EP1376598 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [E]US2004160804 (RINERSON DARRELL [US], et al); | [E]US2004160817 (RINERSON DARRELL [US], et al); | Examination | US2002057593 |