EP1387238 - Method and apparatus for reproducing information using a security module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/24] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohiyama, Kiyoshi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Yoshitake, Toshiyuki c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Yasuhiro c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Morioka, Kiyonori c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Williams, Michael Ian, et al Haseltine Lake Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254734.1 | 29.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | JP20020221856 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002221856 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1387238 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1387238 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387238 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
H04N21/4143 (EP,US);
G06F21/1064 (EP,US);
G06F21/1077 (EP,US);
G06F21/109 (EP,US);
G06F21/52 (EP,US);
G06F21/6281 (EP,US);
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
G06F21/72 (EP,US);
G06F21/87 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/36] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Wiedergabe von Information mit einem Sicherheitsmodul | [2004/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for reproducing information using a security module | [2004/06] | French: | Procédé et appareil de reproduction d'informations utilisant module de sécurité | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07102108.3 / EP1795991 | EP07102109.1 / EP1795992 | EP07102110.9 / EP1795993 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2002116959 ; | [A]US4446519 (THOMAS DAVID C [US]) [A] 7-11,17,27-31,37 * column 2, line 7 - line 55 *; | [Y]US4817140 (CHANDRA ASHILESHWARI N [US], et al) [Y] 18,38 * abstract * * claim 32 *; | [Y]EP0471538 (GEC MARCONI HOLDINGS [GB]) [Y] 7-11,17,27-31,37,12-16,32-36 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US5524229 (NOZAKI MINORU [JP]) [Y] 18,38 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 22 *; | [Y]WO9716786 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 6,26 * abstract *; | [A]WO9913615 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-6,19-26,39,40 * abstract * * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 14 *; | [Y]US6006328 (DRAKE CHRISTOPHER NATHAN [AU]) [Y] 7-11,17,27-31,37 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 29 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 2 *; | [XY]EP1076279 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-5,19-25,39,40 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0057] * [Y] 6-18,26-38; | [Y]US6205550 (NARDONE JOSEPH M [US], et al) [Y] 7-11,17,27-31,37 * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 27 *; | [Y]US6289455 (KOCHER PAUL C [US], et al) [Y] 12-16,32-36 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 63 *; | [A]US2002018384 (SUMITANI KEN [JP], et al) [A] 18,38* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0050] *; | [Y]US2002083318 (LAROSE GORDON EDWARD [CA]) [Y] 12-16,32-36 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] *; | [Y] - COHEN F B, OPERATING SYSTEM PROTECTION THROUGH PROGRAM EVOLUTION, COMPUTERS & SECURITY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, PAGE(S) 565-584, (19931001), ISSN 0167-4048, XP000415701 [Y] 7-11,17,27-31,37 * abstract * * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.4] * * paragraph [02.8] * * paragraph [2.10] - paragraph [2.11] * * paragraph [03.4] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4048(93)90054-9 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020805), vol. 2002, no. 08, & JP2002116959 A 20020419 (SONY CORP) [Y] 18,38 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * | by applicant | EP0471538 | WO9716786 | EP1076279 | - A. S. TANENBAUM, Modern Operating Systems, PRENTICE-HALL, INC., page 246 |