EP1392050 - Image processing method and image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishikawa, Hiromitsu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Saito, Kazuhiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2004/09] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254758.0 | 30.07.2003 | [2004/09] | Priority number, date | JP20020224163 | 31.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002224163 | JP20020224166 | 31.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002224166 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1392050 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1392050 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
H04N1/6097 (EP,US);
H04N1/6022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/13] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bildverarbeitung | [2004/09] | English: | Image processing method and image processing apparatus | [2004/09] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le traitement d'images | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 19.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5502579 (KITA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,17-23,33,34* the whole document *; | [XY]US5508827 (PO-CHIEH HUNG [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,17,18,20,21,33,34 * abstract * * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 40 * [Y] 3,6,7,19,22,23; | [Y]US5729362 (DEISHI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,6,7,19,22,23 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 40; figure 7 * * column 3, line 5 - line 10 * * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 30 *; | [Y]US5991511 (GRANGER EDWARD M [US]) [Y] 3,6,7,19,22,23 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - line 58; figures 5,10-12 * * column 8, line 27 - line 40 * * column 12, line 1 - line 60 * |