EP1388512 - Turret winder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A B Graphic International Limited Southback Lane Bridlington, East Yorkshire YO16 4 PL / GB | [2006/40] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states A B Graphic International Limited Southback Lane Bridlington, East Yorkshire YO16 4 PL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wirth, Andrew Michael 2 Church View Cottages Main Street Kirkburn Driffield East Yorksire YO25 9DL / GB | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson Kings Building South Church Side Kingston-upon-Hull East Yorkshire HU1 1RR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Kings Building, South Church Side Kingston-upon-Hull East Yorkshire HU1 1RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254916.4 | 07.08.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | GB20020018349 | 08.08.2002 Original published format: GB 0218349 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1388512 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1388512 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H18/00, B65H75/02 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
B65H18/0212 (EP,US);
B65H75/50 (EP,US);
B65H2301/5142 (EP,US);
B65H2701/18442 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/07] | Title | German: | Turret Wickler | [2004/07] | English: | Turret winder | [2004/07] | French: | Enrouleur à tourelle | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Request for further processing for: | 08.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2006 | BE | 04.10.2006 | CH | 04.10.2006 | CY | 04.10.2006 | CZ | 04.10.2006 | EE | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | FR | 04.10.2006 | IT | 04.10.2006 | LI | 04.10.2006 | NL | 04.10.2006 | RO | 04.10.2006 | SI | 04.10.2006 | SK | 04.10.2006 | TR | 04.10.2006 | BG | 04.01.2007 | DK | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | ES | 15.01.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | HU | 05.04.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CY | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
FR | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
FR | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 04.10.2006 | |
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 04.10.2006 | |
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | SI | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3940081 (KUBICKI SR EUGENE JOSEPH) [A] 1 * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 61; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4338147 (BAECKSTROEM PER-OLE, et al) [A] * column 2, line 32 - column 2, line 58; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0292924 (MAGNA GRAPHICS CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,9 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 48; figures 1-4 * |