EP1398897 - Method of data communication using a control message [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hu, Teck H. 35 Connelly Avenue Budd Lake, New Jersey 07828 / US | 02 /
Young, Gordon Peter 13 Clintons Green Priestwood, Bracknell RG42 1YL / GB | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2004/12] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255049.3 | 14.08.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | US20020243443 | 13.09.2002 Original published format: US 243443 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1398897 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1398897 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1398897 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L29/00 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
H04L1/1877 (EP,US);
H04L1/16 (KR);
H04L1/1838 (EP,US);
H04L1/1848 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04L2001/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/51] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Datenkommunikation mittels Kontrollmitteilung | [2004/12] | English: | Method of data communication using a control message | [2004/12] | French: | Procédé de communication de données par une message de commande | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 20.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5781598 (HARDY III HARMON S [US]) [A] 10-14 * column 10, line 41 - line 56 * * column 11, line 25 - line 30 ** column 13, line 38 - line 46 *; | [A]US5918002 (KLEMETS ANDERS EDGAR [US], et al) [A] 10-14 * column 2, line 49 - line 67 * * column 11, line 38 - line 63 *; | [XA]WO0020974 (CHEN HUEY SHIANG [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 19 * * page 17, line 3 - line 6 * * page 18, line 8 - page 19, line 6 * * page 27, line 20 - line 25 * [A] 8; | [XA]US6085252 (ZHU QIN-FAN [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * column 5, line 4 - line 13 * * column 6, line 38 - line 43 * * column 7, line 46 - line 61 * * column 10, line 34 - line 43 * * column 11, line 3 - line 7 * * column 11, line 40 - line 57 * * column 12, line 39 - line 45 * [A] 8; | [A]US6424625 (LARSSON PETER [SG], et al) [A] 10-14 * column 2, line 16 - line 27 * * column 3, line 26 - line 30 * * column 5, line 18 - line 48 * * column 8, lines 9,10 * * column 8, line 41 - line 43 * * column 8, line 60 - line 62 * |