EP1391401 - Automatic storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI KOKI CO., LTD. 15-1, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6020 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states HITACHI KOKI CO., LTD. 15-1, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6020 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Koji, Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. No.1060, Takeda Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki ken, 312-8502 / JP | 02 /
Igarashi, Sadato, Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. No.1060, Takeda Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki ken, 312-8502 / JP | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2004/09] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255146.7 | 20.08.2003 | [2004/09] | Priority number, date | JP20020241131 | 21.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002241131 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391401 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1391401 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B65G1/137, G01N35/00 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
G01N35/0099 (EP,US);
B65G1/0435 (EP,US);
B65G1/1378 (EP,US);
G01N2035/042 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0425 (EP,US);
G01N35/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/47] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Automatische Speicheranlage | [2004/09] | English: | Automatic storage system | [2004/09] | French: | Système automatique de stockage | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 13.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0846636 (GEC ALSTHOM SYST ET SERV [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-4,12A-12D *; | [A]US6068437 (BOJE JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6357983 (JUNCA SERGE [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document * |