EP1394082 - Apparatus for transferring and orientating articles, in particular sticks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIDA CO., Ltd. 44, Sanno-cho, Shogoin, Sakyo-ku Kyoto 606-8392 / JP | [2010/15] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Ishida Co., Ltd. 44, Sanno-cho, Shogoin, Sakyo-ku Kyoto 606-8392 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takigawa, Tadashi c/o Ishida Co., Ltd Shiga Integrated Facility 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3026 / JP | 02 /
Iwasaki, Hiroshi c/o Ishida Engineering Co. Ltd. 4-6-17 Ryousenji Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3035 / JP | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255443.8 | 01.09.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | JP20020257028 | 02.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002257028 | JP20030187751 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003187751 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1394082 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1394082 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1394082 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/252 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
B65G47/90 (EP,US);
B65G47/252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Übertragen und Ausrichten von Gegenständen, insbesondere von Stangen | [2004/10] | English: | Apparatus for transferring and orientating articles, in particular sticks | [2004/10] | French: | Dispositif de transfert et d'orientation d'articles, notamment de bâtonnets | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.2010 | BE | 14.04.2010 | CY | 14.04.2010 | CZ | 14.04.2010 | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | FI | 14.04.2010 | NL | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | IE | 01.09.2010 | LU | 01.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | FR | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | HU | 15.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LU | 01.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LU | 01.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 14.04.2010 | |
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 14.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3563377 (SOUTHCOTT FREDERICK) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US4064016 (VORTMANN WALTER) [X] 1,7 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 27; figures 3,6 *; | [A]US5277533 (CARIDIS ANTHONY A [US], et al) [A] 1,9* column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 54; figures 1,3 *; | [X]WO0001601 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 18, line 16 - page 19, line 30; figure 8 * |