EP1403345 - Ink jet inks containing additives for reducing puddling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uhlir-Tsang, Linda C. 515 NW Elizabeth Drive Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 02 /
Moffatt, John R. 2675 NE Lancaster no. 123 Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 03 /
Austin, Mary E. 7802 Arboretum Road Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255716.7 | 12.09.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | US20020254993 | 24.09.2002 Original published format: US 254993 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403345 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1403345 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
C09D11/38 (EP,US);
C09D11/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/52] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldrucktinten enthaltend Additive zur Verminderung der Pfützenbildung | [2004/14] | English: | Ink jet inks containing additives for reducing puddling | [2004/14] | French: | Encres pour l'impression jet d'encre contenant des additifs pour diminuer la formation de flaques | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4361843 (COOKE THEODORE M, et al) [X] 1,2,5,9 * claim - *; | [X]EP0404494 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-3* claim - *; | [X]US5916358 (BAGCHI PRANAB [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * example -; claim 3 *; | [X]EP1239014 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * claim 3; tables 1,2 *; | [PX]EP1279707 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [PX] 1-10 * paragraph [0017] *; | [PX]EP1304364 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [PX] 1-10 * paragraph [0018] * |