EP1398995 - Switching structures for hearing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Starkey Labs, Inc. 6600 Washington Avenue South Eden Prairie Minnesota 55344 / US | [2012/21] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states Starkey Labs, Inc. 6600 Washington Avenue South Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sacha, Mike. K 6260 Near Mountain Boulevard Chanhassen, Minnesota 55317 / US | 02 /
Bren, Mark A. 23531 County Road 10 Loretto, Minnesota 55357 / US | 03 /
Peterson, Timothy S. 7049 Antelope Drive Lino Lakes, Minnesota 55014 / US | 04 /
Roberts, Randall W. 17640 Lorence Way Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55346 / US | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/12] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255764.7 | 16.09.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | US20020244295 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: US 244295 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1398995 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1398995 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1398995 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
H04R25/43 (EP,US);
H04R25/50 (US);
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
H04R25/558 (EP,US);
H04R2225/31 (EP,US);
H04R2225/51 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/12] | Title | German: | Schaltstruktur für Hörgerät | [2004/12] | English: | Switching structures for hearing aid | [2004/12] | French: | Structure d'interrupteur pour prothèse auditive | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2011 | 10.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2003 | AT | 23.05.2012 | BE | 23.05.2012 | CY | 23.05.2012 | CZ | 23.05.2012 | EE | 23.05.2012 | FI | 23.05.2012 | IT | 23.05.2012 | RO | 23.05.2012 | SE | 23.05.2012 | SI | 23.05.2012 | SK | 23.05.2012 | TR | 23.05.2012 | BG | 23.08.2012 | GR | 24.08.2012 | ES | 03.09.2012 | IE | 16.09.2012 | LU | 16.09.2012 | PT | 24.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.09.2012 | ||
LU | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 23.05.2012 | |
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 23.05.2012 | |
SE | 23.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1133236 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 58* the whole document *; | [X]GB1254018 (BERNA IND LTD) [X] 42-58 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2510731 (WARNKE EGON FRED) [A] 1-12 * pages 3-4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0031152 (WEBER LABORGERAETE MEDTECH [DE]) [A] 54 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE3109049 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-21 * page 3, line 32 - page 5, line 23 * * page 7, lines 1-31 * * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 10; figures 2,4 * [Y] 22,30; | [XY]DE3734946 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-21 * the whole document * [Y] 22,37,38; | [A]CH670349 (PHONAK AG) [A] 1-21,23 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0223950 (MICRO EAR TECH DBA MICRO TECH [US], et al) [X] 67-76 * page 4, line 3 - page 6, line 14; figures 2,3 * [Y] 22-29; | [XY]EP1196008 (MICROTRONIC NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [X] 22-41,59-66 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0022] - [0028] - [0036] , [0038]; figures 2,3,8; claims 28-31 * [Y] 22-30,37,38 | Examination | US2002094098 | - MICHAEL J CARUSO ET AL, "A New Perspective on Magnetic Field Sensing", 19980501, (19980501), pages 1 - 19, URL: http://www.magneticsensors.com/datasheets/new_pers.pdf, XP007916754 |