EP1426711 - Cooling apparatus and method for controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yoon-Young 312-1101, Dongsin Apt. Youngtong-dong Paldal-Gu, Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Bae, Hak-Gyun 302-505 Jookong 3 Apt. Ok-dong Andong-City Kyungsangbuk-Do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Chang-Nyeun 106-303, SsangYong Apt. 64 Imun-Dong Dongdaemun-Gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Jae-Seung 210-102 HyunDai Apt. Banwoul-Ri Taean-Eub Hwasung-City, Kyungki-Do / KR | 05 /
Kim, Myung-Wouk 852 Yuchon-Dong, Seo-Gu Kwangju-City / KR | 06 /
Seo, Eung-Ryeol 105-503 Chumdan Namyang Park 765-6 Wallgea-Dong Kwangsan-Gu Kwangju-City / KR | [2015/23] |
Former [2004/24] | 01 /
Kim, Yoon-Young 312-1101, Dongsin Apt. Youngtong-dong Paldal-Gu, Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | ||
02 /
Bae, Hak-Gyun 302-505 Jookong 3 Apt. Ok-dong Andong-City Kyungsangbuk-Do / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Chang-Nyeun 106-303, SsangYong Apt. 64 Imun-Dong Dongdaemun-Gu Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
Lee, Jae-Seung 210-102 HyunDai Apt. Banwoul-Ri Taean-Eub Hwasung-City, Kyungki-Do / KR | |||
05 /
Kim, Myung-Wouk 852 Yuchon-Dong, Seo-Gu Kwangju-City / KR | |||
06 /
Seo, Eung-Ryeol 105-503 Chumdan Namyang Park 765-6 Wallgea-Dong Kwangsan-Gu Kwangju-City / KR | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2007/07] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2004/24] | Chugg, David John Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256198.7 | 01.10.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | KR20020076636 | 04.12.2002 Original published format: KR 2002076636 | KR20030008174 | 10.02.2003 Original published format: KR 2003008174 | KR20030017221 | 19.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003017221 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1426711 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1426711 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1426711 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F25B5/04, F25D11/02, F25D17/06, F25D21/06 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
F25D17/065 (EP,US);
F25B41/37 (EP,US);
F25B5/04 (EP,US);
F25D17/042 (EP,US);
F25D21/08 (EP,US);
F25B2400/0409 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0251 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2501 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2511 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/13] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlgerät und Steuerverfahren desselben | [2004/24] | English: | Cooling apparatus and method for controlling the same | [2004/24] | French: | Appareil de refroidissement et son procédé de commande | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 21.01.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.02.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60159575 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9615413 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 32-34 * page 70, line 8 - line 18 *; | [X]WO9616364 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 32-34 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH1047827 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [X] 32-34 * abstract *; | [A]DE19756860 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 31* the whole document *; | [A]WO9932836 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 31 * claim 6 *; | [X]JP2001280784 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 32-34 * abstract *; | [X]US2002069654 (DOI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-31,35 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2002166331 (PARK JOON HYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 32-34 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1394481 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1,31 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2002069654 | US2002166331 |