EP1406377 - Dual motor configuration with primary brushless motor and secondary integrated speed control motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Würzburg Ohmstraße 2a 97076 Würzburg / DE | [2009/52] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Inc. 700 Park Avenue East Chatham, Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makaran, John 119 Odessa Avenue London, Ontario N6J 2Z9 / CA | 02 /
Maier, Erich Kuehlenbergstrasse 30A 97078 Wuerzburg / DE | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03256211.8 | 01.10.2003 | [2004/15] | Priority number, date | US20020263633 | 03.10.2002 Original published format: US 263633 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1406377 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/67, F01P7/04 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
F01P7/048 (EP,US);
F04D25/166 (EP,US);
F04D27/004 (EP,US);
F01P2005/025 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | Zweimotorenanordnung mit einem ersten bürstenlosen Motor uind einem zweiten bürstenlosen Motor mit integrierter Geschwindigkeitssteuerung | [2004/15] | English: | Dual motor configuration with primary brushless motor and secondary integrated speed control motor | [2004/15] | French: | Configuration double moteur avec un premier moteur sans balais et avec un deuxième moteur sans balais avec commande de vitesse integré | [2004/15] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 14.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002147235 ; | [A]US4779577 (RITTER BERNHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,18 * column 4, lines 15-48; figure 2 *; | [A]US6199398 (TAKEUCHI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,18,19 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1241358 (FAURECIA IND [FR])[A] 1,17,18; | [PA]US2002155804 (POUTOT LAURENT [FR], et al) [PA] 1,17,18 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 33-40 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002147235 A 20020522 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [A] 1,2,7,18,19 * abstract * | Examination | WO0233264 | US6404150 | by applicant | US4779577 | WO0233264 | JP2002147235 | US6404150 |